U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Correia et al v. Marine Travelift, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Public Docket Note]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Request]
  • April 10, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 27, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Quash]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.