U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10410
  • Case Name: New Midland Farms Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting Continued]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Response]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Extend Time]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Show Cause in Writing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Entry]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Emergency Determination]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Emergency Determination]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Setting Post Conversion Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Corrective Action Taken (TEXT ONLY)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Converting Case To Chapter 7]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.