U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10924
  • Case Name: Rui G. Santos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Pay Wages]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Regarding Plan Payments]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Terminate Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
December, 2024
  • December 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • December 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.