U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10004
  • Case Name: Stephanie Duverge
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Terminate Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Hearing Not Held]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Debtor]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Notice to the Court]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Delay Discharge]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Delay Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Initial Financial Management Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Order to Show Cause in Writing Terminated]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Ch 7 Installment Payment for Efiled Case]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.