U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Vitality Land Holdings, LLC et al v. Loan Funder LLC, Series 44501 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 14, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Strike]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.