U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Eddington v. Providence Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss for failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.