U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10858
  • Case Name: Wayne David Silva, II
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Form 122C-2 Calculation of Your Disposable Income]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Form 122C-1 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Agreement - LF 2083-1.1]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Terminate Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Utility -Convert Case Event]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 13 (Attorney use only)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Striking]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Dismiss Case for Abuse]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Generic Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Extend Time (523/727)]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.