U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00376
  • Case Name: Doe v. Brown University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 22, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Public Docket Note]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Entering Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.