U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10300
  • Case Name: Johanna Leon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Post Conversion Report (Former Trustee Use)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Order Requiring Post Conversion Report]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Hearing Not Held]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Utility -Convert Case Event]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Form 122A-1 Statement of Your Monthly Income (means test)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Payment Advices]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Schedule of Post Petition Debts]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7(Attorney use only)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Creditor List Upload (original list of creditors)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Pay Filing Fee]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.