U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10303
  • Case Name: Noel Franco
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Agreement - LF 2083-1.1]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Payment Advices]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Form 122C-1 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Add Judge (this is not Private Entry)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.