U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-24391
  • Case Name: Bernice Hence
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing]
  • October 25, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing]
  • October 25, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Discharging Trustee And Closing (DISMISSED 13) Case - Closes Case]
  • October 22, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Accounting And Report]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Order Directing Debtor To Change Payments To Trustee]
  • June 24, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Meeting Of Creditors Held]
May, 2015
  • May 17, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Clerk's Approval of Applic Pay Filing Fee Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.