U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mj-01097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strickland
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
  • August 23, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2016: [Detention]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.