U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mj-04151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thirkill
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 16, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 12, 2016: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.