U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00003
  • Case Name: Eisenach v. Floortex USA, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.