U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00006
  • Case Name: J M Smith Corporation v. Cherokee Pharmacy and Medical Supply Inc et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • October 09, 2018: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2018: [Status Report]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Status Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2017: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order]
  • April 27, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • April 26, 2017: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • April 19, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 05, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 04, 2017: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • April 04, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • March 28, 2017: [Response (non-motion)]
  • March 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.