U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-mj-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • June 22, 2020: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • June 22, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • June 22, 2020: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 12, 2018: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2018: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • February 06, 2018: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • February 06, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • February 06, 2018: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • May 26, 2017: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.