U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lundgren
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Commitment to Another District]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2017: [Bond ]
  • December 05, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • December 05, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 05, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 04, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.