U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-mj-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 25, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 23, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2018: [Consulate Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 11, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • January 11, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.