U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-01002-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order]
  • March 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2018: [Dismiss]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 22, 2018: [Seal]
  • February 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 20, 2018: [Seal]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.