U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-po-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hanson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Transcript]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice re CJA Voucher]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • November 13, 2018: [Response (non-motion)]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 01, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • September 26, 2018: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • September 25, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 19, 2018: [Pretrial Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2018: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 05, 2018: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 07, 2018: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order of Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 03, 2018: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 03, 2018: [Add Counts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.