U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-01017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguilar-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 04, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 04, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • February 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.