U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-01016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Esquivel-Alonso
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • February 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Material Witness Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 04, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 04, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • February 04, 2019: [Material Witness Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2019: [Affidavit ]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • February 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • February 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.