U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-04087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order Terminating Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • June 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • February 19, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 22, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • January 22, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 15, 2019: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 16, 2019: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • October 16, 2019: [Leave to File Sentencing Document Under Seal]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 11, 2019: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 15, 2019: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.