U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00017
  • Case Name: United States of America v. October 7, 2018 Seizure of $114,990 United States Currency et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.