open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00214
    Party Name:Nored et al v. Tennessee Department of Intellectual and Developmental Disabilities et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Revise]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Consent/Nonconsent]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Subpoena Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Revise]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons NOT Issued]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?90513
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =