U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-01079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turner
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • July 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.