open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee
    Case Number:19-26405
    Party Name:Stephanie Teresa Hill Jones
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Ch 13 Trustee Report/Recomm To Dsm Failure To Comply w Standing Order]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Agreed / Consent Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Minutes]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Statement Continuing Meeting Of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Order Staying Wage Garnishments - Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Statement About Payment of Eviction Judgment (Form 101B)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment (Form 101A)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Notice Of Hearing - All Documents]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Meeting Of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Order Directing Debtor To Make Payments To Trustee]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Clerk's Approval of Applic Pay Filing Fee Installments]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Meeting Of Creditors Ch 13]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Update Chapter 13 Deficiency Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Corrective Entry (Filer Must Take Further Action)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Application To Pay Filing Fee In Installments]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Chapter 13 - Form 122C-1 Statement Of Your Monthly Income]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Matrix]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Form 121 - Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stevenson, Chapter 13 George W. [Voluntary Petition (Ch 13 - Atty Case Opening Only)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Ch 13 - Atty Case Opening Only)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tnwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?527525
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =