open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00229
    Party Name:Gash et al v. Goins et al (PSLC1)
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Consent/Nonconsent]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response (non-motion)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Public Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Public Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?91203
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =