U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00038
  • Case Name: In Re: Nonjudicial Civil Forfeiture Proceeding (PLR1)
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.