U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00070
  • Case Name: Tennessee State Conference of the NAACP v. Hargett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 08, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Quash]
  • February 28, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 15, 2020: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • January 14, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 09, 2020: [Quash]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 07, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 02, 2020: [Quash]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.