open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00046
    Party Name:Dennis v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Revise]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Failure to File CCI]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?93315
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =