open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00052
    Party Name:Patel et al v. AR Group Tennessee, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Receiver]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Change Venue]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tnmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?81786
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =