U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monteverdi
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • October 02, 2020: [Commitment to Another District]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 02, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order of Detention]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • September 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 22, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.