Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00041-1
    Party Name:USA v. Perkins
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Supervised Release Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of 14 Day Rule to file Objections to R&R]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Referral on Plea (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Allocution before Magistrate Judge on Probation Revocation]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Financial Status]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention on Petition for Offender under Supervision]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In - Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out - Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Information Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Sealed Document]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Miscellaneous Hearing]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Arrest - Within District/Other Divisional Office (Mag Case Only)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 12 - REVOKE]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Factual Resume/Basis]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Right to Appeal]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SRT Violation - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Docket Correction]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - SRT/Probation Violation]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appointing Counsel (FORM)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Supplemental Attachment to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Findings of Fact (Plea)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - Pretrial Discovery & Inspection]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order ]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [auto docketing digital audio upload]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Rule 32 Time Limits]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings of Fact on Plea]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Plea before Magistrate (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Rearraignment]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Cancelling Deadline]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add Attorney]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Rearraignment]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting District Court Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain Defendant without Bond]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Sealed Presentence Investigation Report Filed]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Initial Disclosure of PSR to Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark (No Doc #)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order Accepting Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Bond Filed]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (SEALED)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Terminate Attorney]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Search Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 12]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Summons Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:March 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 12A]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Personal Data Sheet (SEALED)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Letter Requesting Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit in Support]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Information Petty]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 (40) Papers Sent]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Bond]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Identity and Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Detention - Temporary]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Receipt of Bond Payment]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Pretrial Services Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Document]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest - Rule 40 ]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver to Proceed by Video]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PSI - Sentencing Recommendation]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Non-Motion]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Standing Order pursuant to Johnson v. United States]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Factual Resume]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent for Magistrate to Take Plea]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Hearing]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Elements of the Offense]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Downward Departure (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Presentence Investigation Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Addendum]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Confidential Sentencing Recommendation (Sealed)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Sentencing]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:April 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Letter]
    Date Published:February 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Issuance]
    Date Published:December 16, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:November 25, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1155073
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =