open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:2:18-cr-01416-1
    Party Name:USA v. Linares Guadron
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment (AO 245)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Setting/Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates (FORM)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Magistrate to Plea]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Re-Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue - Cr]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1613872
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =