Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00795
    Party Name:Byman v. Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Regarding Initial Conference - FORM - Judge Ellison]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1643986
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =