open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-01462
    Party Name:Unzueta v. William, et al.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Interested Parties]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1659314
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =