open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00963
    Party Name:Complete Merchant Solutions v. Federal Trade Commission
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Propose Schedule]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117875
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =