U.S. District Court for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00392-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bramlette
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.