U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00423-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.