U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ketchum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 29, 2021: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.