U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00464-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curtis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • January 12, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Petition and Order]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 11, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.