U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00468-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lieberman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 27, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 26, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 24, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.