U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tapusoa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.