U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00471-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rouse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Exclude]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 18, 2022: [Detention]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.