U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00487-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greaves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 28, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.