U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00516-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marin-Barragan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 20, 2022: [Strike]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.