U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00528-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nshimiyimana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 24, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Trial Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.