U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wolfgramm
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Review of Detention]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.