U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 27, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.